Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2013
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin, Frosh, King, Madaleno, Manno, Montgomery, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robey, and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified stores to charge and collect a 5-cent fee for each disposable carryout bag the store provides to a customer; authorizing specified stores to retain a specified amount of the fee; requiring the operator of specified stores to remit a specified amount of money to the Comptroller; and requiring the Comptroller to distribute specified amounts of money to the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, the Chesapeake Bay Trust, and eligible counties under specified circumstances.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1086
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1247 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM