Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Pharmacies and Pharmacists - Information on and Sales of Prescription Drugs
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Mathias, Middleton, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a pharmacy benefits manager from prohibiting a pharmacy or pharmacist from providing a beneficiary with information regarding the retail price of a prescription drug or the amount of the cost share share for a prescription for which the beneficiary is responsible; prohibiting a pharmacy benefits manager from prohibiting a pharmacy or pharmacist from discussing with a beneficiary a certain retail price or certain cost share for a prescription drug; providing for the construction of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0736
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {117276/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Pharmacy Benefits Managers – Pharmacies and Pharmacists – Information on and Sales of Prescription Drugs
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {117276/1 Adopted 40
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Pharmacies and Pharmacists - Information on and Sales of Prescription Drugs
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 42
House 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 43
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218
Text - Chapter - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Pharmacies and Pharmacists - Information on and Sales of Prescription Drugs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-1611 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM