Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pharmacists - Administering Injectable Medications and Biological Products
Sponsored by
Senators Young and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a pharmacist who meets the requirements of certain regulations to administer an injectable medication or a biological product to a patient under certain circumstances; requiring the State Board of Pharmacy, on or before September 1, 2020, and in consultation with the State Board of Physicians and the State Board of Nursing, to adopt regulations for pharmacists to administer an injectable medication or biological product; establishing certain requirements for the regulations; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0419
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Text - First - Pharmacists - Administering Injectable Medications and Biological Products
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-101, 12-509 )
(   15-716 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM