Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Makerspace Initiative Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Senators McCray and Edwards
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Makerspace Initiative Pilot Program in the Maryland Technology Development Corporation to encourage the establishment and expansion of makerspaces throughout the State; authorizing the Corporation to award certain financial assistance to local governments, certain designees of local governments, and certain nonprofit entities for the establishment of makerspaces in the State; requiring the Governor, for fiscal year 2023, to include $275,000 in the annual budget bill for the Makerspace Initiative Fund; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0443
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0826 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2021
Legislative Date
1/31/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Economic Development - Makerspace Initiative Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
4/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {357972/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Economic Development - Makerspace Initiative Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/31/2021 1/31/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Text - First - Economic Development - Makerspace Initiative Pilot Program
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 4/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Favorable with Amendments {357972/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Economic Development - Makerspace Initiative Pilot Program
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 40 Click to view Recorded Media
(   10-401,   10-473 through 10-477, 9-101   )
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 6:08 PM
Click to return on the top page