Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsored by
Senator Raskin
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that a Maryland corporation or a real estate investment trust has the power to renounce specified business opportunities in its charter or declaration of trust or by a specified resolution; repealing specified provisions of law relating to dividends payable in shares of one class of a corporation's stock to holders of shares of another class of the corporation's stock; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0882
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {328670/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
60
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable with Amendments {328670/1 Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 59
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 60
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-103, 2-309, 2-403, 2-404, 2-405, 2-408, 2-502, 2-507, 2-510, 3-104, 3-105, 3-109, 3-511, 8-102, 8-201, 8-301, 8-501.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM