Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Racing Commission - Equine Medical Director - Employment and Costs
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Racing Commission to employ an equine medical director; and requiring the Commission to direct that thoroughbred and standardbred track licensees, thoroughbred and standardbred owners and trainers, and thoroughbred and standardbred breeders pay the cost of employing the equine medical director based on a specified percentage.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0481
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Racing Commission - Equine Medical Director - Employment and Costs
Senate 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM