Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property Records
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Bates, Benson, Brochin, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Eckardt, Feldman, Guzzone, Hough, Kagan, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Norman, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Ready, Reilly, Robinson, Rosapepe, Salling, Serafini, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Enabling private entities to accept the use of a certain substitute address by a victim of domestic abuse who is a participant in an address confidentiality program; requiring any person to accept a certain address of a participant in an address confidentiality program as the address of the participant; prohibiting a person from knowingly and intentionally seeking and obtaining the actual address or telephone number of a participant in an address confidentiality program; requiring the Secretary of State to adopt regulations; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0633
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {748278/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property Records
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments {748278/1 Adopted 44
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property Records
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 46
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 45
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61A
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 69
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424
Text - Chapter - Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property Records
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-519, 4-520, 4-521 through 4-524, 4-525, 4-526, 4-527, 4-528, 4-529, 4-530 )
(   3-101, 3-114 through 3-120 )
(   7-301, 7-302, 7-303 through 7-306, 7-307, 7-308, 7-309, 7-310, 7-311, 7-312 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM