Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Reporting of Death and Burial or Disposal of Body - Requirements and Penalties
Sponsored by
Senators Shank and Jacobs
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified individuals who have personal knowledge of the death of another individual or who have personally discovered a body to provide specified notice of the death within 4 hours to a specified law enforcement officer, physician, or 9-1-1 system; prohibiting an individual from burying or disposing of a body except in a specified manner; and establishing a specified penalty.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1236
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Senate 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Senate 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing cancelled (Finance)
Senate 3/19/2014 3/20/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-101, 5-514 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM