Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Victims and Witnesses – U Nonimmigrant Status – Certification of Victim Helpfulness
Sponsored by
Senators Ramirez, Madaleno, and Manno
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing, for purposes of filing a petition for U Nonimmigrant Status, a victim of qualifying criminal activity or the victim's family member to request a certifying official to certify victim helpfulness on a Form I-918, Supplement B certification if the victim has been helpful in the detection, investigation, or prosecution of the qualifying criminal activity; providing the circumstances under which a victim shall be considered to be helpful for purposes of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0616 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {988776/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Immigration - U Nonimmigrant Status and Enforcement
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable with Amendments {988776/1 Adopted 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
Text - Third - Victims and Witnesses – U Nonimmigrant Status – Certification of Victim Helpfulness
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-930, 11-931 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM