Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - University System of Maryland - Quasi-Endowment Funds
Sponsored by
Senators King, Currie, DeGrange, Ferguson, Guzzone, Manno, McFadden, and Peters
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland to make a one-time transfer of no more than $50,000,000 from the State-supported fund balance to a quasi-endowment fund; and limiting the use of specified proceeds to specified purposes.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.
Senate 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 46
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Second Reading Passed 46
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Appropriations 50
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM