Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit Program
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Currie, Feldman, King, McFadden, and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a credit against the State income tax for 50% of an investment, not to exceed specified amounts, made in a qualified innovation business; requiring a qualified investor to meet specified requirements in order to be eligible for the credit; requiring the Department of Business and Economic Development to administer the credit; establishing the Maryland Angel Investor Tax Credit Reserve Fund as a special continuing, nonlapsing fund; applying the Act to taxable years after 2014; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0789
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-737 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM