Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Patent Infringement - Assertions Made in Bad Faith
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Brinkley, Feldman, Glassman, Kelley, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Mathias, and Pugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 307
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from making specified assertions of patent infringement in bad faith; authorizing a court to consider specified factors as evidence of whether a person has made an assertion of patent infringement in bad faith or in good faith; authorizing specified individuals to bring an action in a specified court to recover for injuries or losses sustained as a result of a violation of the Act; authorizing a court to award damages and remedies under specified circumstances; specifying an exception; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {537679/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {253799/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Senators Astle, Pugh, and Kittleman
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Motion Recede (Delegate Davis) Adopted
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
House Recede
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 307
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/28/2014 3/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments {537679/1 Report Adopted 38
Senate 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38
Senate 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 40
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Economic Matters 43
House 4/01/2014 4/02/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable with Amendments {253799/1 Report Adopted 62
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) 63
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Senate Requests House Recede 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Conference Committee Appointed 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Senators Astle, Pugh, and Kittleman 60
House 4/07/2014 4/03/2014 Motion Recede (Delegate Davis) Adopted 70
House 4/07/2014 4/03/2014 House Recede 70
House 4/07/2014 4/03/2014 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 70
Senate 4/08/2014 4/01/2014 Returned Passed 66A
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 307
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-1601 through 11-1605 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM