Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsored by
Senator Pugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a system for adjudication of a claim involving a birth-related neurological injury; excluding specified rights and remedies of a claimant and specified other persons; providing for specified procedures; providing for specified benefits and compensation of a claimant under the Act; establishing the Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund; providing for specified premiums and insurance surcharges to be used to finance and administer the Fund; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0553
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0798 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/10/2015 Text - First - Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-2D-01 through 3-2D-08 )
(   20-1601 through 20-1603 )
(   32-101 through 32-304 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM