Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Devices Capable of Accessing Content on the Internet - Blocking Capability (Human Trafficking Prevention Act for Maryland)
Sponsored by
Senator Robinson
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting certain businesses from doing business in the State unless they provide a digital blocking capability for Internet-accessible devices that makes inaccessible certain unlawful electronic or visual depictions or certain websites that facilitate certain unlawful acts; requiring certain businesses to make reasonable and ongoing efforts to ensure that the digital blocking capability functions properly; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Devices Capable of Accessing Content on the Internet - Blocking Capability (Human Trafficking Prevention Act for Maryland)
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   19-901 through 19-906 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page