Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Federal and State Mental Health and Addiction Parity Laws - Report on Compliance
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring health maintenance organizations, insurers, and nonprofit health service plans that offer specified contracts and health benefit plans to submit to the Maryland Insurance Commissioner a report certifying and outlining how designated contracts and health benefit plans comply with the federal Mental Health Parity and Addiction Equity Act and State mental health and addiction parity laws; requiring the report to be submitted on specified dates by a specified person and to include specified information; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1010
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-703.2 )
(   15-802.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM