Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Regional Institutes for Children and Adolescents - Report Before Closure
Sponsored by
Senators King, Feldman, Kagan, and Madaleno
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 685
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to submit a report, justifying the closure, to the Governor and specified legislative committees before a regional institute for children and adolescents may be closed; requiring the report to address specified items; and requiring the committees to have 60 days to review and comment on the report.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1509
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Motion Special Order until next session (Delegate Carozza) Rejected (46-83)
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-2)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 685
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/03/2016 3/04/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 38
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Second Reading Passed 38
Senate 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 40
House 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations 42
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Motion Special Order until next session (Delegate Carozza) Rejected (46-83) 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (132-2) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Returned Passed 63A
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 685
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM