Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Libraries - Reorganization of Governance Structure
Sponsored by
Senators King, Benson, Currie, Eckardt, Edwards, Feldman, Jennings, Kagan, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, Middleton, Muse, Norman, Peters, Ready, Serafini, Waugh, Zucker, and Ferguson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland State Library Agency and the Maryland State Library Board; transferring the duties of the Library Development and Services Division in the State Department of Education to the State Library Agency; transferring the duties of the State Board of Education pertaining to libraries to the State Library Board; providing that the appointment of the State Librarian is subject to the advice and consent of the Senate; requiring geographic diversity in the Governor's appointments to the State Library Board; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1094
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Libraries - Reorganization of Governance Structure
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 2:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {679033/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education - Libraries - Reorganization of Governance Structure
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Education - Libraries - Reorganization of Governance Structure
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Education - Libraries - Reorganization of Governance Structure
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 2:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments {679033/1 Adopted 46
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Education - Libraries - Reorganization of Governance Structure
Senate 3/20/2017 3/18/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 47
House 3/21/2017 3/18/2017 Referred Ways and Means 52
House 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61A
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Text - Chapter - Education - Libraries - Reorganization of Governance Structure
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   23-101, 23-101 through 23-108, 23-201, 23-202 through 23-205, 23-206, 23-301, 23-302, 23-402, 23-405, 23-406, 23-504, 23-506, 23-506.1, 23-507, 23-508, 23-509, 23-510, 25-302 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM