Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Repeal
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bates, Brochin, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Klausmeier, Muse, Norman, Ready, Reilly, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, and Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that, on or before July 1, 2013, a county or municipality subject to a specified municipal stormwater permit adopt and implement laws or ordinances to establish a watershed protection and restoration program; repealing the requirement that a county or municipality maintain or administer a local watershed protection and restoration fund; repealing the requirement that a county or municipality establish and annually collect a stormwater remediation fee; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0481
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
18A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Pugh) Adopted 18A
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2015 3/12/2015 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-201.1, 4-202.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM