Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Career Education Act of 2019
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a county board to award credit for time spent by a high school student toward a high school diploma or a postsecondary credential for work-based training and classroom instruction completed under a youth apprenticeship program; authorizing certain applicants for legislative scholarships to be enrolled in Workforce Development Sequence courses or be participating in an apprenticeship training program; authorizing certain recipients of a senatorial scholarship to use the scholarship to reimburse certain expenses; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1250
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Career Education Act of 2019
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {204938/1
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {204938/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/27 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {514435/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Career Education Act of 2019
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
56
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Career Education Act of 2019
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {204938/1 52
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted 52
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {204938/1 Adopted 52
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Senate 3/25/2019 3/21/2019 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Kagan) Adopted 53
Senate 3/25/2019 3/21/2019 Motion Special Order until 3/27 (Senator Kagan) Adopted 53
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Floor Committee Amendment {514435/1 Adopted 55
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Text - Third - Career Education Act of 2019
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 56
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-101, 18-402, 18-405, 18-406, 18-501, 18-504, 18-506, 7-205.4, 7-301.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM