Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Rental-Purchase Transactions
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Benson, Forehand, Kasemeyer, Montgomery, and Muse
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 294
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the contents of a rental-purchase agreement; establishing a summary of costs form; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0334
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/05/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {667472/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
34
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 294
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2013 2/05/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/20/2013 2/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/25/2013 2/25/2013 Favorable with Amendments {667472/1 Report Adopted 32
Senate 2/25/2013 2/25/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 32
Senate 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 34
House 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 First Reading Economic Matters 37
House 3/27/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 57
House 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Second Reading Passed 57
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 59
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 294
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-1101, 12-1103, 12-1104, 12-1111, 12-1111.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM