Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - School Construction Master Plan Workgroup
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Anne Arundel County School Construction Master Plan Workgroup; providing for the composition and staffing of the Workgroup; requiring the Workgroup to make recommendations regarding options to meet identified needs at lower costs, methods to improve the maintenance and rehabilitation of county schools, and options to increase cost sharing; requiring the Workgroup to report its findings and recommendations on or before December 31, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0942
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - School Construction Master Plan Workgroup
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - School Construction Master Plan Workgroup
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM