Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Solitary Confinement - Restrictions
Sponsored by
Senators Gladden and Hough
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting an inmate in a State or local correctional facility from being placed in specified solitary confinement unless specified conditions are met; requiring a correctional facility to maintain specified documentation and make specified periodic reports to the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services; and requiring the Department to make specified information available on the Department's Web site.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/12/2016 2/15/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page