Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Phased Restoration
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bates, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Klausmeier, Muse, Norman, Ready, Reilly, Salling, Serafini, and Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the portion of highway user revenues that is distributed to local governments; altering the allocation of the local share of highway user revenues among Baltimore City, counties, and municipalities; and repealing obsolete language.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0484
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
18A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Pugh) Adopted 18A
Senate 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-402, 8-403 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM