Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Garrett County - Payment to Rescue Squads
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 695
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the Public Local Laws of Garrett County to require the Board of County Commissioners of Garrett County to appropriate specified funds for the benefit of specified rescue squads; and authorizing the County Commissioners to pay the value of a specified appropriation to a rescue squad by in-kind payment of personnel, equipment, or services.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0758
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Garrett County - Payment to Rescue Squads - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {664337/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Garrett County - Payment to Rescue Squads
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {830718/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Garrett County - Payment to Rescue Squads
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 695
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Garrett County - Payment to Rescue Squads
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Garrett County - Payment to Rescue Squads - Repeal
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Favorable with Amendments {664337/1 Adopted 39
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
Text - Third - Garrett County - Payment to Rescue Squads
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 43
House 3/28/2017 3/28/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {830718/1 Adopted 65
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 67
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Garrett County - Payment to Rescue Squads
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 695
Text - Chapter - Garrett County - Payment to Rescue Squads
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM