Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Bureau of Revenue Estimates - Tax Incidence Study - Scope and Intergovernmental Assistance
Sponsored by
Senators Zucker and Elfreth
Status
In the House - First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the scope of certain tax incidence studies submitted by the Bureau of Revenue Estimates; requiring governmental units involved in the implementation or administration of the taxes and charges evaluated in the study to provide promptly any information requested to the Bureau and otherwise cooperate with the Bureau in order to assist the Bureau in preparing certain tax incidence studies; and applying the Act to studies submitted after September 30, 2021.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0712
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Bureau of Revenue Estimates - Tax Incidence Study - Scope
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {559634/1 Adopted
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Referred Ways and Means Appropriations
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Bureau of Revenue Estimates - Tax Incidence Study - Scope
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2021 2/24/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/24/2021 2/15/2021 Favorable with Amendments {559634/1 Adopted 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2021 2/15/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Bureau of Revenue Estimates - Tax Incidence Study - Scope and Intergovernmental Assistance
Senate 3/02/2021 2/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 18AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Referred Ways and Means Appropriations 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/4/2021 1:53 PM
Click to return on the top page