Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workgroup on Workforce Development for Community Health Workers
Sponsored by
Senators Jones-Rodwell, Conway, Astle, Brinkley, Feldman, Glassman, Kelley, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Mathias, Middleton, Pugh, and Ramirez
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 181
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene and the Maryland Insurance Administration to establish a specified stakeholder workgroup; requiring, to the extent practicable, at least 50% of the membership of the workgroup be composed of individuals who are directly involved in or represent an institution or organization that is directly involved in the provision of nonclinical health care; requiring the workgroup to conduct a study and make recommendations on or before June 1, 2015; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1257
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {527978/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {836788/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 181
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/14/2014 3/17/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments {527978/1 Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48
House 3/20/2014 3/17/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 53
House 3/26/2014 3/26/2014 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/28/2014 3/28/2014 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable with Amendments {836788/1 Report Adopted 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) 64
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendment 61
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Passed Enrolled 61
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 181
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM