Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Lawyers - Fees - Payment by Credit or Debit Card
Sponsored by
Senators Ramirez, Hough, and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Court of Appeals to allow an applicant to the Bar or a lawyer to use a credit or debit card to pay an examination fee or any other fee required for admission to the bar and any annual fee assessed against a lawyer; and authorizing the Court of Appeals to charge a processing fee for each credit or debit card payment not exceeding the actual cost incurred in processing the credit or debit card payment.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0540 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/02/2016 3/03/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM