Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin, Astle, Benson, Brochin, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Feldman, Guzzone, Hough, Jennings, Kagan, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Muse, Norman, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Ramirez, Ready, Rosapepe, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a court, under specified circumstances, to terminate the parental rights of an individual found to have committed an act of nonconsensual sexual conduct against the other parent that resulted in the conception of a child; specifying that a termination of parental rights under the Act terminates completely specified rights of a parent; authorizing the court to approve a supervised visitation arrangement under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0646
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {928178/1
Proceedings
67
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments {928178/1 67
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-1401 through 5-1404 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM