Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act - Modifications
Sponsored by
Senator Kelley
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a certain designee who may conduct a certain assessment to be certified or licensed, rather than certified and licensed; authorizing a person serving a certain term of confinement for an offense relating to volume dealing in cocaine base imposed on or before September 30, 2017, to file a motion to modify or reduce the sentence under certain circumstances; altering the membership of the Justice Reinvestment Oversight Board; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1082
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1418 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Justice Reinvestment Act - Modifications
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Justice Reinvestment Act - Modifications
Senate 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-601, 5-609.1, 5-612.1 )
(   9-3202, 9-3203 )
(   16-303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM