Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Investment Funds - Eligible Recipients
Sponsored by
Senator Serafini
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Defining "technology-based business" as an entity or investment vehicle that is domiciled in the State, operates in the State, or is reasonably expected to invest in entities in the State for the purpose of making grants and equity investments from certain programs under the Maryland Technology Development Corporation; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0955
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Investment Funds - Eligible Recipients
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM