Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Colleges - Facilities Renewal Grant Program - Established
Sponsored by
Senators King, Guzzone, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Pinsky, Robinson, Young, Zucker, and Peters
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 688
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Community College Facilities Renewal Grant Program to provide State funds to community colleges for improvements, repairs, and deferred maintenance projects; requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to administer the Program; requiring the Governor to annually appropriate a certain amount in a certain budget to the Commission; requiring a certain appropriation to be in addition to the appropriation for a certain other program; establishing requirements and limitations in awarding grants; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0403
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Community Colleges - Facilities Renewal Grant Program - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {319635/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Community Colleges - Facilities Renewal Grant Program - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {414469/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Community Colleges - Facilities Renewal Grant Program - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 688
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Community Colleges - Facilities Renewal Grant Program - Established
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Community Colleges - Facilities Renewal Grant Program - Established
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {319635/1 Adopted 48
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Community Colleges - Facilities Renewal Grant Program - Established
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Appropriations 50
House 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable with Amendments {414469/1 Adopted 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 60
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Community Colleges - Facilities Renewal Grant Program - Established
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 688
Text - Chapter - Community Colleges - Facilities Renewal Grant Program - Established
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-320 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM