Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone, Peters, DeGrange, Kasemeyer, King, Madaleno, and McFadden
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax under specified circumstances for specified retirement income attributable to a resident's employment as a law enforcement officer or the individual's service as fire, rescue, or emergency services personnel; defining "emergency services personnel" as emergency medical technicians or paramedics; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0100
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1166 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {359233/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {515463/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments {359233/1 Adopted 46
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel
Senate 3/20/2017 3/18/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 47
House 3/21/2017 3/18/2017 Referred Ways and Means 52
House 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable with Amendments {515463/1 Adopted 63
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 64
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 61
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153
Text - Chapter - Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM