Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senator Washington
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain individuals employed by federal agencies to comply with certain provisions of law; establishing that an applicant to obtain a certified social worker license is required to meet certain requirements by December 21, 2023; altering the number of hours of certain supervision an applicant for a certified social worker-clinical license is required to complete; specifying that certain supervision is to be provided in accordance with regulations adopted by the State Board of Social Work Examiners; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0811
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/18/2021 12:48 PM
Click to return on the top page