Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Provisions - Open Meetings Act - Enforcement and Training
Sponsored by
Senators Manno and Madaleno
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Open Meetings Law Compliance Board, under specified circumstances, to issue specified orders and impose specified civil penalties not to exceed $500; expanding the scope of the training requirements under the Open Meetings Act to include all employees, officials, and members of a public body; requiring that specified individuals complete specified training on the Open Meetings Act within 90 days of becoming an employee, an official, or a member of a public body; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0823
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/30/2016 3/31/2016 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-209, 3-210, 3-211, 3-213 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM