Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Inmates - Menstrual Hygiene Products
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Kelley, Astle, Benson, Brochin, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Kagan, King, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Middleton, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Norman, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Ready, Robinson, Rosapepe, Salling, Smith, Young, Zucker, Zirkin, and Cassilly
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Patuxent Institution and each local correctional facility and each correctional facility in the Division of Correction to have a written policy and procedure in place requiring that menstrual hygiene products be provided at no cost to a female inmate at certain times; requiring the Director of the Patuxent Institution and the managing official of a correctional facility to ensure that the correctional facility has a sufficient supply of menstrual hygiene products to meet the needs of the inmate population at all times; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0797
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Services - Inmates - Menstrual Hygiene Products
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {908075/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Correctional Services - Inmates - Menstrual Hygiene Products
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Correctional Services - Inmates - Menstrual Hygiene Products
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Correctional Services - Inmates - Menstrual Hygiene Products
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {908075/1 Adopted 35
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Correctional Services - Inmates - Menstrual Hygiene Products
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 37
House 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Referred Judiciary 38
House 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255
Text - Chapter - Correctional Services - Inmates - Menstrual Hygiene Products
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-214, 9-616 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM