Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement – Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs – Small Business Reserve Program and Veteran–Owned Small Business Enterprise Program
Sponsored by
Senator Smith
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the Small Business Reserve Program includes certain veteran-owned small business enterprises that meet certain criteria; requiring the Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs to adopt regulations to establish a certain overall percentage goal of certain procurement contracts to be made with veteran-owned small business enterprises; requiring certain solicitation documents to include certain information; altering the required contents of a certain annual report; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0790
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Procurement – Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs – Small Business Reserve Program and Veteran–Owned Small Business Enterprise Program
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/17/2021 2/17/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/17/2021 2/17/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/18/2021 6:31 PM
Click to return on the top page