Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Expedited Partner Therapy for Chlamydia and Gonorrhea
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health and Mental Hygiene)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 183
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing specified provisions of law establishing an Expedited Partner Therapy Pilot Program in the Baltimore city Health Department; providing for the purpose of expedited partner therapy; authorizing licensed physicians, advanced practice registered nurses, and physician assistants who diagnose chlamydia or gonorrhea in an individual patient to prescribe, dispense, or otherwise provide prescription antibiotic drugs to that patient's sexual partners without examination of that patient's partners; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
18A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {284832/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {156686/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-4)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 183
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Pugh) Adopted 18A
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/03/2015 3/04/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Favorable with Amendments {284832/1 Report Adopted 36
Senate 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
Senate 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 38
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations 40
House 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable with Amendments {156686/1 Report Adopted 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/10/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-4) 66
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendments 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 183
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-214.1 )
(   2007, 2010 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM