Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
African American Heritage Preservation Program - Reestablishment and Revisions
Sponsored by
Senators McFadden, Miller, Astle, Bates, Benson, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Eckardt, Edwards, Feldman, Ferguson, Gladden, Guzzone, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, Middleton, Montgomery, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Norman, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, Ready, Rosapepe, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, Waugh, Young, and Zirkin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Reestablishing the African American Heritage Preservation Program in the Maryland Historical Trust to identify and preserve buildings, communities, and sites of historical and cultural importance to the African American experience in the State; requiring the Trust to develop and administer the Program in partnership with the Commission on African American History and Culture; requiring the Governor, for each fiscal year, to include $1,000,000 for the Program in the annual operating or capital budget; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0130
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/13/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Second Reading Passed 44
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation 45A
House 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 62
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM