Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Gas Pipelines - Safety Reporting Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a gas transmission company to submit a specified report on the state of its gas pipelines to the Public Service Commission and to an owner of real property on which the gas pipeline is located or adjacent to or contiguous to real property on which the gas pipeline is located; requiring a report under the Act to include specified information; requiring the Commission to make specified reports available to the public, including by publication on the Commission Web site; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1028
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/22/2013 3/25/2013 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-101, 15-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM