Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Aging Prisoners - Conditional Parole
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin, Astle, Bates, Benson, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Eckardt, Edwards, Feldman, Ferguson, Gladden, Guzzone, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Lee, Manno, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Montgomery, Nathan-Pulliam, Norman, Peters, Pugh, Ramirez, Rosapepe, Serafini, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing conditional parole as a form of release from incarceration for inmates over the age of 64 years under specified circumstances; establishing a means of initiating consideration by the Maryland Parole Commission of the appropriateness of granting conditional parole; requiring the Commission to provide for a conditional parole hearing on receipt of a specified request; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0622
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM