Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Pretrial Release - Prior Crimes
Sponsored by
Senator Pugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 567
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a District Court commissioner from authorizing the pretrial release of a defendant charged with a crime of violence if the defendant has previously been convicted of a specified crime; and prohibiting a District Court commissioner from authorizing release of a defendant charged with a specified crime if the defendant has previously been convicted of a crime of violence.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0374
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {858172/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 567
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/04/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments {858172/1 Report Adopted 39
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
Senate 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 First Reading Judiciary 43
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/31/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 58A
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Second Reading Passed 58A
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 59
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 567
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 5-202 )
(   14-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM