Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Mobile Carrying Device - Definition
Sponsored by
Senators McCray and Nathan-Pulliam
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Defining "mobile carrying device" for purposes of the Maryland Vehicle Law; and altering a certain definition to specify that a mobile carrying device is not a vehicle for purposes of the Maryland Vehicle Law.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Mobile Carrying Device - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Mobile Carrying Device - Definition
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-133.1, 11-176 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM