Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Gas Pipelines - Construction Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a gas transmission company from beginning construction on a gas pipeline before the finalization of specified legal proceedings, including approval by the Board of Public Works, permit and license applications, condemnation proceedings, easement negotiations, and appeals to specified judgments and determinations.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0984
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/22/2013 3/25/2013 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-101, 15-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM