Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Relations - Employment Discrimination - Protection for Interns
Sponsored by
Senators King, Astle, Benson, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Edwards, Feldman, Ferguson, Gladden, Guzzone, Jennings, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Kelley, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Montgomery, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, Rosapepe, Salling, Waugh, Young, and Zirkin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing specified protections for interns and applicants for internships from specified discriminatory acts; providing that a specified intern has access to a specified complaint resolution procedure or, under specified circumstances, may file a complaint with the Maryland Commission on Civil Rights for specified nonmonetary administrative remedies; providing that the Act does not create an employment relationship between an employer and an intern for the purposes of specified remedies or specified provisions of law; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0229
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {288575/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-2)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-1)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Favorable with Amendments {288575/1 Report Adopted 40
Senate 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Senate 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Third Reading Passed (44-2) 42
House 3/16/2015 3/13/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations 43A
House 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2015 3/31/2015 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-1) 59
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-601, 20-610 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM