Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on the Distribution of Funding for Senior Citizen Activities Centers
Sponsored by
Senator Pugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on the Distribution of Funding for Senior Citizen Activities Centers; requiring the Task Force to study the existing distribution of funding, the distribution and needs of the an increasingly senior population, and evaluate funding distribution models and options; requiring the Task Force to make recommendations on the needs of senior citizens to the Secretary of Aging, Secretary of Housing and Community Development, and specified members of the General Assembly on or before October 1, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0978
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM