Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Aggressive Drunk Driving - Punitive Damages
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin, Astle, Benson, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Feldman, Ferguson, Gladden, Guzzone, Jennings, Kagan, Kasemeyer, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Montgomery, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Ramirez, Rosapepe, Waugh, Young, and Zirkin
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a finder of fact to determine that a person with an alcohol concentration of 0.15 or more in the blood or breath of the person who causes personal injury or wrongful death while driving or attempting to drive a motor vehicle was acting with malice and to award punitive damages under specified circumstances; limiting liability for punitive damages under this Act to the person driving or attempting to drive the motor vehicle; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0351 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {538170/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/12/2015 3/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments {538170/1 Report Adopted 43
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 First Reading Judiciary 45A
House 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM