Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Abuse-Deterrent Opioid Analgesic Drug Products - Coverage
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Astle, Benson, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Eckardt, Feldman, Ferguson, Gladden, Guzzone, Jennings, Kagan, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Miller, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Ramirez, Young, Zirkin, Hershey, Kelley, Middleton, and Reilly
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 372
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations to provide coverage for at least two brand name abuse-deterrent opioid analgesic drug products and, if available, at least two generic abuse-deterrent opioid analgesic drug products; prohibiting the insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations from requiring an insured or an enrollee to first use a specified drug product before providing coverage for a specified abuse-deterrent opioid analgesic drug product; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0887
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {497879/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Middleton) {283023/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 372
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/13/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Favorable with Amendments {497879/1 Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Middleton) {283023/1 Adopted 44
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations 45A
House 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 62
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 372
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-848 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM