Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland College Collaboration for Student Veterans Commission
Sponsored by
Senator Waugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 413
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland College Collaboration for Student Veterans Commission; providing that the purpose of the Commission is to work to ensure the educational success of returning veterans, facilitate the sharing of best practices among institutions of higher education, and work with institutions of higher education to provide specified services to veterans; requiring the Commission to meet at least four times each year; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1458
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {214533/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {744865/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-1)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 413
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments {214533/1 Report Adopted 46
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Appropriations 50
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments {744865/1 Report Adopted 61
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-1) 62
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 61
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Passed Enrolled 61
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 413
(   9-949 through 9-954 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page