Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Child Abuse and Neglect - Training
Sponsored by
Senators Shank, Forehand, Jacobs, Raskin, and Stone
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring each health occupation board authorized to issue a license or certificate to adopt specified regulations regarding training on the identification and reporting of child abuse and neglect; specifying requirements for the training; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {448172/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/03/2014 3/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Favorable with Amendments {448172/1 Report Adopted 40
Senate 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Senate 3/10/2014 3/07/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41A
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations 44
House 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM