Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Joint Committee on Behavioral Health and Opioid Use Disorders
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Astle, Bates, Benson, Cassilly, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Edwards, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Kagan, Kasemeyer, King, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Montgomery, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Norman, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, Rosapepe, Salling, Waugh, Young, Zirkin, Serafini, and Ready
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Joint Committee on Behavioral Health and Opioid Use Disorders; specifying the purposes of the Joint Committee are to review the final report of the Governor's Heroin and Opioid Emergency Task Force, review and monitor the activities of the Governor's Inter-Agency Heroin and Opioid Coordinating Council, monitor the effectiveness of specified programs, policies, and practices, review compliance with specified federal and State laws by health insurance carriers, and identify areas of concern and corrective measures; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0896
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {447977/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {676289/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/21/2016 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments {447977/1 Report Adopted 46
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations 49
House 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {676289/1 Report Adopted 64
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) 65
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendment 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Passed Enrolled 62
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-10A-02 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM